ST MARY'S SCHOOL ASCOT

Charity number: 290286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 19 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 19 December 2016 On time Download