BECK ROW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 290393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/08/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.13k £706 £490 £667 £0
Total expenditure £4.40k £3.85k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A