Financial history BISHOP HO MING WAH ASSOCIATION AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 290398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £84.63k £360.17k £65.59k £51.71k £50.72k
Total expenditure £84.31k £92.69k £96.86k £54.71k £55.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A