Register of Charities - The Charity Commission HAWKINS MEMORIAL PRIZE
Charity number: 525868-2
Removed charity
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 2 JUNE 1942 AND SCHEMES OF 20 SEPTEMBER 1977 AND 10 NOVEMBER 1982
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN LYMM HIGH SCHOOL (“THE SCHOOL”) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO BY ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 23 August 1966: Standard registration
- 16 December 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 December 2020: Funds transferred to 525868 LYMM GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.