Financial history IES LONDON THE LONDON CENTRE OF THE INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS (ILLINOIS) LIMITED

Charity number: 290456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £4.96m £5.31m £5.49m £5.22m £1.10m
Total expenditure £5.12m £5.42m £5.50m £5.81m £1.03m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £89.39k £466.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £89.39k £466.77k
Income - Other trading activities £1.45k £3.01k £2.62k £1.62k £129
Income - Charitable activities £4.95m £5.31m £5.49m £5.13m £628.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £307 £112 £602 £2.37k £1
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.12m £5.42m £5.50m £5.81m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0