Register of Charities - The Charity Commission WATKIN TRAVELLING BURSARY
Charity number: 525868-7
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 OCTOBER 1945 AND SCHEMES OF 20 SEPTEMBER 1977 AND 10 NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE OR ASSIST A PUPIL OF LYMM GRAMMAR SCHOOL TO VISIT SOME FOREIGN COUNTY OR TO ATTEND A VOCATIONAL COURSE IN THE BRITISH ISLES WHERE THE PURPOSE IS THE PROMOTION OF INTERNATIONAL UNDERSTANDING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 23 August 1966: Standard registration
- 16 December 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 December 2020: Funds transferred to 525868 LYMM GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.