ASSOCIATION TO AID THE SEXUAL AND PERSONAL RELATIONSHIPS OF THE DISABLED LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1984: Standard registration
- 04 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SPOD (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION TO AID THE SEXUAL AND PERSONAL RELATIONSHIPS OF THE DISABLE LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 MAY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF THOSE DISABLED WHETHER BY BIRTH, ACCIDENT, DISEASE OR OTHERWISE, PERSONAL RELATIONSHIP PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window