Trustees MARKFIELD BEAM ENGINE AND MUSEUM

Charity number: 290486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Stell Trustee 08 August 2020
None on record
Abdullah Seba Trustee 20 October 2019
WALTHAMSTOW PUMPHOUSE MUSEUM
Received: On time
Andrew Lewis Trustee 16 September 2018
None on record
Ian Mclauglin Trustee 24 November 2013
None on record
Alan Elliott Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
DAVID RONALD STANLEY CRACKNELL Trustee 02 May 2012
None on record