Accounts and annual returns LYMPSHAM MANOR HALL

Charity number: 290487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required