Financial history LYMPSHAM MANOR HALL

Charity number: 290487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.88k £2.70k £2.28k £2.76k £5.29k
Total expenditure £2.02k £2.28k £2.08k £2.82k £3.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A