MRS L D ROPE'S THIRD CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 290533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 19 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 12 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 12 September 2016 On time Download