HEALTH LIMITED

Charity number: 290535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.92m £16.05m £19.17m £17.86m £19.60m
Total expenditure £17.41m £17.54m £18.21m £18.03m £19.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.86m £4.89m £5.37m £5.50m £7.27m
Income - Donations and legacies £868.93k £412.74k £421.61k £586.51k £530.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.83k £0 £43.07k £112.25k
Income - Charitable activities £17.59m £14.02m £18.72m £15.17m £17.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.23k £13.19k £27.17k £10.56k £16.18k
Income - Other £2.46m £1.59m £0 £2.05m £1.87m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £8.15k £25.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.01m £17.20m £17.87m £17.61m £18.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £397.88k £336.29k £337.03k £425.59k £502.38k
Expenditure - Governance £68.87k £0 £18.86k £33.61k £42.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0