ST EDMUND'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 290539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 October 2018 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 29 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required