Trustees Design West
Charity number: 290575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Stuart Fairham | Chair | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Coralie Mckeivor | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Murphy | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Waterhouse | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hani Salih | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Alex Bayley Loyn | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Hilton | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cora Kwiatkowski | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Rhys Eddy | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Childs | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elena Marco Burguete | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.