SURREY COUNTY YOUTH WIND ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is established to advance the musical education of the members of the orchestra; to develop more extended relationships between members, staff and parents; to engage in activities which support the orchestra and advance the musical education of its members; to provide and assist in the provision of facilities for musical education in the orchestra.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 November 1984: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 March 2010: Standard registration
- SCYWO (Working name)
- SURREY COUNTY WIND ORCHESTRA PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Jane Ritchie | Chair | 16 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Caroline Pearce | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|||||
LYNN MYALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN MYALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £364 | £37 | £0 | £40 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTIO ADOPED 19TH OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED 25TH MAY 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR OF YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY BY SUPPORTING THE MUSICAL ACTIVITIES OF THE SURREY COUNTY WIND ORCHESTRA.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O SURREY ARTS
WESTFIELD SCHOOL
BONSEY LANE
WOKING
GU22 9PR
- Phone:
- 01483519307
- Email:
- surreyarts@surreycc.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window