Financial history THE REDBOURN PARISH CHURCH DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 290633
Charity reporting is overdue by 415 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £4.29k £26.38k £3.74k £1.16k £1.41k
Total expenditure £7.88k £41.00k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A