Trustees NORTH DEVON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 290640

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Chidgey | Chair | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lavercombe | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jarvis | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
George Paviour-Coward | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Donohue | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Elizabeth Wallis | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Homa | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jack Tighe | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE CHANNING | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Mark Etheridge | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.