Financial history HIGHGATE NEWTOWN COMMUNITY PARTNERS

Charity number: 290712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £289.51k £268.38k £482.85k £446.75k £410.62k
Total expenditure £216.86k £246.97k £373.41k £425.21k £440.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £99.00k £217.00k £198.98k £130.00k