HIGHGATE NEWTOWN COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 290712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Murley Garfield Hodge Trustee 04 February 2015 None on record
Phillip J Whale Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Robert Leonard Schon Trustee 04 February 2020 None on record
Oliver Charles Aaron Lewis Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
ROBERT GEORGE SEYMOUR AITKEN Chair 04 November 2016 None on record
BARBARA IRENE SMITH Trustee 04 November 2016
HOLLY LODGE COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time
Rev David Edward Paxton Currie Trustee 10 September 2019 None on record
Rev Andrew John Bruce Meldrum Trustee 12 March 2014 None on record
James Duncan Robin Trustee 07 January 2015 None on record
Olutomi Ayodeji Trustee 11 December 2020
WOLLASTON AND PAUNCEFORT ALMSHOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
Father Damien D R Mason Trustee 19 January 2019 None on record
Dr JOHN WOOLFE CARRIER Trustee 08 June 2016
THE BIRKBECK AND WILLIAM ELLIS SCHOOLS TRUST Received: On time
BIRKBECK AND WILLIAM ELLIS SCHOOLS TRUST Received: On time