Trustees THE CENTRAL BRITISH FUND FOR WORLD JEWISH RELIEF

Charity number: 290767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maurice Harold Helfgott Chair 28 January 2021
None on record
Annabel Mahgerefteh Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Prerna Pramod Wadikar Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Alan Rousso Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Kevin David Sneader Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Dina Shiloh Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Elliot David Moss Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
RACHEL INGRAM Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record
Jeremy Steven Newman Trustee 28 January 2021
THE JOY AND MALCOLM LYONS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NORMALYN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Hilda Rosemary Worth Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
James Daniel Bilefield Trustee 25 June 2018
None on record