Financial history ST JOHN THE BAPTIST GREEK ORTHODOX TRUST

Charity number: 290806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £220.20k £250.29k £269.05k £174.40k £199.77k
Total expenditure £159.94k £180.35k £191.17k £175.79k £158.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £16.01k £1.24k