THE LONDON MOZART PLAYERS TRUST

Charity number: 290833
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David James Lamberti Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record
Lady Lydia Mary Thompson Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
Professor Sir Robert Ian Lechler Trustee 04 November 2019
THE HARRY WOOLHOUSE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Roy Abel Simpson Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record
The Hon EMILY SOPHIA WEDGWOOD BENN BA Trustee 17 September 2015 None on record
Nick Mallett Chair 17 September 2015
MONTGOMERY HEIGHTS ZIMBABWE CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
SUTTON CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING AND LEARNING Received: On time
Roanna Mary Gibson Trustee 19 December 2019 None on record
Francis Hornak Trustee 17 September 2015 None on record