SOUTH WEST NORFOLK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 290911
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2018 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 14 December 2016 On time