CALCUTTA RESCUE FUND

Charity number: 290917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 14 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 10 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download