Financial history 3RD SANDHURST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 290940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.71k £13.75k £15.30k £11.76k £18.30k
Total expenditure £17.24k £15.03k £13.04k £13.20k £8.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k