Accounts and annual returns THE SALTASH AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN COMMITTEE

Charity number: 290997
Charity reporting is overdue by 1699 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1334 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1334 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1699 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1699 days