HERTFORDSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 291037
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2021 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 September 2021 90 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 22 March 2017 On time Download