HERTFORDSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 291037
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £554.31k £587.51k £523.27k £592.20k £129.62k
Total expenditure £536.80k £570.91k £583.37k £618.60k £297.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £65.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £16.33k £42.14k £19.63k £35.99k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £105.25k £87.47k £120.67k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £481.16k £419.20k £400.89k £420.26k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £56.81k £913 £287 £277 N/A
Income - Other £0 £20.00k £15.00k £15.00k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £35.99k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £288.48k £291.92k £293.08k £316.73k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £248.32k £278.99k £289.65k £301.87k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.25k £3.76k £3.96k £2.80k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £642 £0 N/A