VIVA CHAMBER ORCHESTRA LTD

Charity number: 291046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £770.35k £783.03k £733.23k £665.50k £695.07k
Total expenditure £597.40k £873.94k £736.84k £692.12k £527.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £65.60k
Income from government grants £15.45k £15.45k £243.71k £10.00k £76.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £106.09k £95.34k £83.52k £34.29k £177.68k
Income - Other trading activities £18 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £652.39k £675.83k £591.06k £580.36k £486.94k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3 £14 £14 £111 £22
Income - Other £11.85k £11.85k £11.85k £50.73k £30.43k
Income - Legacies £0 £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £431.63k £702.81k £563.76k £517.14k £357.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.49k £38.06k £40.48k £38.28k £36.46k
Expenditure - Governance £130.28k £133.07k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £130.28k £133.07k £132.59k £136.70k £133.78k