VIVA CHAMBER ORCHESTRA LTD

Charity number: 291046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Stewart Geary Trustee 10 December 2019
CLASSICS FOR ALL Received: On time
Anthony Alfred Peter Davis Chair 01 January 2019
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA Received: On time
Margaret Cookhorn Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Carl Lars Muldal Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
Dr Stephen Coventon Willoughby Trustee 02 July 2020 None on record
Parmindar Johal Trustee 14 January 2021 None on record
Andrew Nicklin Trustee 19 December 2017 None on record
Warrick Nathan Matthews Trustee 13 March 2014 None on record
ROBIN JOHN WOOD Trustee None on record