Accounts and annual returns MRS MARY OLIVIA SAFFERY TURNER FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 291059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2022 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 December 2019 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required