THE POLONSKY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 291143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download