Financial history BROMLEY 'Y'

Charity number: 291181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.05m £1.28m £1.38m £1.90m £1.97m
Total expenditure £983.58k £1.31m £1.37m £1.59m £1.75m
Income from government contracts £767.05k £1.13m £1.13m £1.73m £1.89m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.08k £13.44k £14.60k £6.31k £7.46k
Income - Other trading activities £6.67k £3.89k £1.50k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.27m £1.36m £1.89m £1.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £641 £1.05k £1.55k £194
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £978.12k £1.31m £1.37m £1.59m £1.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £200 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £86.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.46k £0 £0 £0 £0