Accounts and annual returns THE REDCOATS SOCIETY, THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE RIFLES (BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) MUSEUM

Charity number: 291191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required