Accounts and annual returns ST NICOLAS AND ST MARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 291223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required