Financial history DR AMBEDKAR MEMORIAL COMMITTEE OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 291239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £85.61k £128.20k £150.51k £60.66k £96.70k
Total expenditure £79.92k £63.74k £146.23k £61.35k £71.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A