Accounts and annual returns ST MARY AT CLYMPING CHURCH HALL CO LIMITED

Charity number: 291255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required