THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR PASTORAL CARE IN EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
tO ESTABLISH LINKS BETWEEN EDUCATORS WHO HAVE AN INTEREST IN PASTORAL CARE AND PERSONAL SOCIAL EDUCATION THROUGH MEMBERSHIP OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THE QUARTERLY JOURNAL "PASTORAL CARE IN EDUCATION"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 1985: Standard registration
- NAPCE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR PHIL JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Noel David Purdy | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Silver | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILL FRANCES JANE ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.96k | £17.82k | £19.37k | £23.83k | £31.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.50k | £20.30k | £19.69k | £20.97k | £24.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 1995. AS AMENDED ON 07 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Howes Farm
Doddinghurst Road
Pilgrims Hatch
BRENTWOOD
Essex
CM15 0SG
- Phone:
- 07532408835
- Email:
- admin@napce.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window