VICTOR ADDA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activity of the trust is the continued support of the Fan Museum Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
Governance
- 10 April 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY HAWES | Chair | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH ESTHER ALEXANDER | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ZEITLIN ESTELLE | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELENE ESTHER ALEXANDER FRSA MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.99k | £50.69k | £273.48k | £64.59k | £71.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.48k | £54.00k | £46.49k | £89.66k | £59.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 April 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 April 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 June 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 June 2021 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE INCLUDING (BY WAY OF EXAMPLE AND WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE TRUSTEE' DISCRETION HEREUNDER) THE MAKING OF SUCH DONATIONS (WHETHER OF THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNFETTERED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT TO ANY TRUST ORGANISATION CORPORATION OR BODY WHITCH IS REGISTERED AS A CHARITY UNDER TH PROVISIONS OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1960.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Bank Street
London
E14 4SG
- Phone:
- 0207 597 3392
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window