THE WYKEHAM CENTRE AND CHURCH HOUSE

Charity number: 291485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £95.33k £126.69k £83.82k £85.29k £108.90k
Total expenditure £103.45k £129.21k £93.66k £108.94k £115.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A