Trustees NORFOLK AND NORWICH NATURALISTS' SOCIETY

Charity number: 291604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR A LEECH Chair
None on record
SUSAN HEATHCOTE GALE Trustee 22 March 2022
MANCROFT ADVICE PROJECT (MAP)
Received: On time
Joe Harkness Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Timothy Peter Strudwick Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
John Frederick Hobbs Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Sarah Eleanor Marion Butler Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Tania Cherrie Evanns Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Samuel Neal Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Alice Brigham Liddle Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Dr Nicholas Mark Collins Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Dr Janet Alison Higgins Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
MS D ASHTON Trustee 13 March 2018
None on record
DR J LESTER Trustee 08 March 2016
THE NORFOLK ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
MR C CHAPMAN Trustee 25 March 2014
None on record
MR J FROUD Trustee 17 April 2013
None on record
MR F J L FARROW Trustee
None on record