LONDON JUPITER ORCHESTRA TRUST

Charity number: 291606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required