LONDON JUPITER ORCHESTRA TRUST

Charity number: 291606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £228 £185 £0 £40.29k £0
Total expenditure £228 £185 £0 £38.21k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A