Accounts and annual returns 1ST COPTHORNE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 291680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 10 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 25 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window