CONSONANT LTD

Charity number: 291789
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 March 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 March 2020 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 August 2016 On time Download