BRITISH AMERICAN DRAMA ACADEMY

Charity number: 291796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 10 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 10 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 09 January 2017 On time Download