BRITISH AMERICAN DRAMA ACADEMY

Charity number: 291796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £2.34m £2.28m £2.18m £2.20m £2.06m
Total expenditure £2.34m £2.22m £2.23m £2.08m £2.07m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.90k £19.73k £22.20k £47.65k £11.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.16m £2.10m £1.99m £1.96m £1.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £170.14k £158.54k £172.10k £188.22k £189.59k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.34m £2.22m £2.23m £2.08m £2.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.07k £19.37k £19.37k £21.82k £21.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0