BRITISH AMERICAN DRAMA ACADEMY

Charity number: 291796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oluwadamilare Ewedemi Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record
Malcolm John Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record
MARCUS JARLATH BOYLE Chair 24 January 2006
THE SERPENTINE TRUST Received: On time
Ruth Hogarth Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
MAGGIE WHITLUM-COOPER Trustee None on record
Christopher Patrick Eason Cook Trustee 23 December 2018 None on record
Melanie Whitaker Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Zoe Jane Ashcroft Trustee 16 June 2021
SPONSORS FOR EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY LIMITED Received: 3 days late
THE CLIMATE CHANGE ORGANISATION Received: On time
Lydia Carlston Trustee 15 October 2019 None on record
Richard Dean Johnson Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record
DIANE GELON Trustee
IGNITE FUTURES LTD Received: On time
Louise Jeanne Chantal Trustee 30 November 2015 None on record