MEMBERS EMERGENCY BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE INSTITUTE OF CHIROPODISTS AND PODIATRISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help members who are in distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 August 1985: Standard registration
- M E B F (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Topham | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Grantham Liggins | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Thompson Preston | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Lesley McCartney | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ALBERT HARVEY | Trustee | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY JANE WRIGHT | Trustee | 30 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ABID ALI | Trustee | 30 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MCNAMARA JEPHCOTE | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SOMUZ MIAH | Trustee | 10 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MISS A J BURNETT-HURST | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.28k | £2.23k | £1.06k | £2.58k | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £932 | £1.91k | £1.25k | £333 | £87 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 27 APRIL 1985 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
RELIEVING MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
150 LORD STREET
SOUTHPORT
MERSEYSIDE
PR9 0NP
- Phone:
- 01704546141
- Email:
- info@iop-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window