TAVISTOCK AREA SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 291932
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH MAY 1985,AS AMENDED 14TH MAY 1990 AND 15 JULY 1993, 31 AUGUST 1995 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF TAVISTOCK AND NEIGHBOURING PARISHES(HEREINAFTER CALLED 'AREA OF BENEFIT').
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 22 August 1985 : registered
  • 15 February 2010 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (GI))
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helped
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information